Medical School:
St. George's University School of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
30 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
24 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
AVP - Family Medicine |
01 Aug 2023 to 23 Oct 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
30 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
24 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Aug 2023 to 23 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa