THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:23:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: Souza Reis, Paula (Used Until: 03 May 2023)
Medical School: Escola Bahiana de Medicina e Saúde Pública (EBMSP), 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Souza Reis, Paula (Used Until: 03 May 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Escola Bahiana de Medicina e Saúde Pública (EBMSP), 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA SOUZA REIS PEREIRA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 28 July, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA SOUZA REIS PEREIRA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SOUZA REIS PEREIRA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 28 July, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Escola Bahiana de Medicina e Saúde Pública (EBMSP), 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
30 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
24 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
AVP - Family Medicine
01 Aug 2023 to 23 Oct 2023
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 30 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 24 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 23 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 28 Jul 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 28 Jul 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023