THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:36:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kito, Karen Terumi (Used Until: 12 May 2025)
Medical School: Universidade de São Paulo Faculdade de Medicina São Paulo (FMSP-USP), 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 462 Paxton Street
Port Perry Ontario L9L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Kito, Karen Terumi (Used Until: 12 May 2025)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade de São Paulo Faculdade de Medicina São Paulo (FMSP-USP), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 462 Paxton Street
Port Perry Ontario L9L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN TERUMI KEAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KEAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KEAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KEAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KEAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KEAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KEAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 5 October, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN TERUMI KEAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KEAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KEAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KEAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KEAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KEAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KEAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 5 October, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade de São Paulo Faculdade de Medicina São Paulo (FMSP-USP), 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 05 Oct 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
AVP - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 05 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 05 Oct 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 05 Oct 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023