Medical School:
University of the West Indies Faculty of Medical Sciences, Jamaica, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Oct 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
31 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Oct 2024 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
24 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Western University |
AVP - Family Medicine |
31 Oct 2023 to 23 Jan 2024 |
Western University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
31 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
24 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Family Medicine
DATE:
31 Oct 2023 to 23 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University