THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: Nwachukwu, Ethel Oluchukwu (Used Until: 17 May 2023)
Medical School: Abia State University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 268 Grosvenor St
St. Joseph's Healthcare London
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Nwachukwu, Ethel Oluchukwu (Used Until: 17 May 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Abia State University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 268 Grosvenor St
St. Joseph's Healthcare London
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ETHEL OLUCHUKWU NJOKU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NJOKU is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. NJOKU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NJOKU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NJOKU shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NJOKU is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NJOKU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ETHEL OLUCHUKWU NJOKU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NJOKU is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. NJOKU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NJOKU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NJOKU shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NJOKU is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NJOKU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Abia State University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
22 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 21 Oct 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
17 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
AVP - Family Medicine
24 Oct 2023 to 16 Jan 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 22 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 21 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 17 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 24 Oct 2023 to 16 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2023