THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:08:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ayub Medical College, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 799 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6565
Fax: 647-493-3231
Address: 10022 King George Blvd
Surrey BC V3T 2W4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7181 Yonge St
Unit 28/29
Thornhill ON L3T 0C7
Phone: 1-833-820-8800
Fax: 1-888-238-2029
Address: 7181 Yonge St
Unit 28/29
Enhanced care Clinic
Thornhill ON L3T 0C7
Phone: 1-833-820-8800
Fax: 1-888-238-2029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: Ayub Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 799 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6565
Fax: 647-493-3231
Address: 10022 King George Blvd
Surrey BC V3T 2W4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7181 Yonge St
Unit 28/29
Thornhill ON L3T 0C7
Phone: 1-833-820-8800
Fax: 1-888-238-2029
Address: 7181 Yonge St
Unit 28/29
Enhanced care Clinic
Thornhill ON L3T 0C7
Phone: 1-833-820-8800
Fax: 1-888-238-2029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ATTAR KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ATTAR KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ayub Medical College, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2023