THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:27:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Urology
10 Oct 2023 to 23 Oct 2023
University of Toronto
EL - Urology
25 Sep 2023 to 09 Oct 2023
University of Toronto
EL - Urology
11 Sep 2023 to 24 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
EL - Urology
28 Aug 2023 to 10 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Urology
DATE: 10 Oct 2023 to 23 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Urology
DATE: 25 Sep 2023 to 09 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Urology
DATE: 11 Sep 2023 to 24 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Urology
DATE: 28 Aug 2023 to 10 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2023