Medical School:
Madras Medical College, 2002
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology |
25 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology |
18 Jul 2024 to 24 Apr 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Neurology |
01 Jul 2024 to 17 Jul 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Neurology |
25 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE:
25 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE:
18 Jul 2024 to 24 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Neurology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 17 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Neurology
DATE:
25 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto