THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:35:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Otolaryngology-Head and Neck Surgery
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5147793123
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Otolaryngology-Head and Neck Surgery
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5147793123
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUSIF AHMED Y ALAMMAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALAMMAR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALAMMAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALAMMAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALAMMAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALAMMAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALAMMAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUSIF AHMED Y ALAMMAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALAMMAR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALAMMAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALAMMAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALAMMAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALAMMAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALAMMAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
25 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 24 Sep 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 25 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 24 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2023