THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:02:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Central del Este (UCE) Facultad de Medicina, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 365 West Street
Norfolk General Hospital
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)429-6975
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Central del Este (UCE) Facultad de Medicina, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 365 West Street
Norfolk General Hospital
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)429-6975
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Sep 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 14 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SANDEEP SINGH MAHAL may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SANDEEP SINGH MAHAL may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Central del Este (UCE) Facultad de Medicina, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Apr 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Mar 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2024