THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:57:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Unit 104
Huntsville Professional Building
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 789 2355
Fax: 705 789 1051
Address: 1 Minerva Street East
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1P2
Phone: 7057870846
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Unit 104
Huntsville Professional Building
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 789 2355
Fax: 705 789 1051
Address: 1 Minerva Street East
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1P2
Phone: 7057870846
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Sep 2024
22 Sep 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 23 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 22 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIA MAGDY MORCOS may practise family medicine at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Algonquin Family Health Team in Huntsville, Ontario;

(ii) Huntsville Health Care Clinic in Huntsville, Ontario;

(iii) Huntsville District Memorial Hospital in Huntsville, Ontario; and

(iv) In accordance with Dr. MORCOS’ Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. MORCOS signed on December 25, 2023.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance; or

(ii) when Dr. MORCOS’ eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada examination expires.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MORCOS’ knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MORCOS’ practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 23 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 22 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIA MAGDY MORCOS may practise family medicine at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Algonquin Family Health Team in Huntsville, Ontario;

(ii) Huntsville Health Care Clinic in Huntsville, Ontario;

(iii) Huntsville District Memorial Hospital in Huntsville, Ontario; and

(iv) In accordance with Dr. MORCOS’ Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. MORCOS signed on December 25, 2023.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance; or

(ii) when Dr. MORCOS’ eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada examination expires.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MORCOS’ knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MORCOS’ practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 23 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 22 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 May 2024
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 22 Sep 2027

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 May 2024