THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:12:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 09 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who were seen at Huron Perth Eye Clinic can contact the clinic for a copy of their records:

Huron Perth Eye Clinic
342 Eire Street Stratford ON
N5A 2N5
Date Received: 17 Feb 2025

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 09 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who were seen at Huron Perth Eye Clinic can contact the clinic for a copy of their records:

Huron Perth Eye Clinic
342 Eire Street Stratford ON
N5A 2N5
Date Received: 17 Feb 2025

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GHULAM FAROOQ DOGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOGAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GHULAM FAROOQ DOGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOGAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2023