THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:47:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: Anthes, Christina Margaret (Used Until: 05 Jul 2023)
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Anthes, Christina Margaret (Used Until: 05 Jul 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Queen's University
EL - Hematology
20 May 2024 to 16 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
EL - Hematology
11 Mar 2024 to 07 Apr 2024
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 20 May 2024 to 16 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 11 Mar 2024 to 07 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2024