THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:11:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Liaquat University of Medical & Health Sciences Jamshoro, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Haliburton Highlands Health Services
7199 Gelert Rd
Algonquin Highlands ON K0M 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-457-1392
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 19 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Liaquat University of Medical & Health Sciences Jamshoro, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Haliburton Highlands Health Services
7199 Gelert Rd
Algonquin Highlands ON K0M 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-457-1392
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 19 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Apr 2024
18 Apr 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 19 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Apr 18 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ALI AKBAR BOHRA may practise emergency medicine with Haliburton Highlands Health Services in Haliburton, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BOHRA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. BOHRA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. BOHRA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 April, 2024, and will expire on or before 18 April, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ALI AKBAR BOHRA may practise emergency medicine with Haliburton Highlands Health Services in Haliburton, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BOHRA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. BOHRA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. BOHRA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 April, 2024, and will expire on or before 18 April, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Liaquat University of Medical & Health Sciences Jamshoro, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 18 Apr 2027