THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:42:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Haramaya University College of Health and Medical Sciences, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston Health Science Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Davies 2, Room 22.2.360
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Haramaya University College of Health and Medical Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston Health Science Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Davies 2, Room 22.2.360
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELAKU GETACHEW GEBREGIORGIS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. GEBREGIORGIS is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. GEBREGIORGIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GEBREGIORGIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GEBREGIORGIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. GEBREGIORGIS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. GEBREGIORGIS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELAKU GETACHEW GEBREGIORGIS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. GEBREGIORGIS is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. GEBREGIORGIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GEBREGIORGIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GEBREGIORGIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. GEBREGIORGIS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. GEBREGIORGIS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Haramaya University College of Health and Medical Sciences, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 08 Apr 2026
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
09 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
16 Jan 2024 to 08 Apr 2024
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 08 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 09 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 16 Jan 2024 to 08 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2024