THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:38:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
LHSC Network
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
LHSC Network
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHELDON VICTOR SMITH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SMITH is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. SMITH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SMITH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SMITH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SMITH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SMITH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHELDON VICTOR SMITH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SMITH is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. SMITH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SMITH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SMITH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SMITH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SMITH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
21 Oct 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 20 Oct 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
09 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 21 Oct 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 20 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 09 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024