THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:40:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: AKINDELE, FOLASADE OLUBUNMI (Used Until: 13 Jul 2023) AKINDELE, FOLASADE BUNMI (Used Until: 13 Jul 2023)
Medical School: University of Ilorin College of Health Sciences, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-795 Gardiners Rd
Kingston ON K7M 7E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 887-8733
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 805 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON K7P 2N6
Phone: (613) 887-8733
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: AKINDELE, FOLASADE OLUBUNMI (Used Until: 13 Jul 2023) AKINDELE, FOLASADE BUNMI (Used Until: 13 Jul 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ilorin College of Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-795 Gardiners Rd
Kingston ON K7M 7E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 887-8733
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 805 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON K7P 2N6
Phone: (613) 887-8733
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Mar 2024
19 Mar 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 20 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Mar 19 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FOLASADE BUNMI ADENIYI may practise pediatrics with Medical Tree Clinic in Kingston, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ADENIYI’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ADENIYI’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ADENIYI’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 March, 2024, and will expire on or before 19 March, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FOLASADE BUNMI ADENIYI may practise pediatrics with Medical Tree Clinic in Kingston, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ADENIYI’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ADENIYI’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ADENIYI’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 March, 2024, and will expire on or before 19 March, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ilorin College of Health Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 19 Mar 2027