THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:55:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Taif University College of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Taif University College of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Taif University College of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
15 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2024 to 14 Jan 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
12 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
15 Jan 2024 to 11 Mar 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 15 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 14 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 12 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Nephrology
DATE: 15 Jan 2024 to 11 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jan 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2024