THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:33:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 College Drive
North Bay Regional Health Centre
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6 Albert Street
West Parry Sound Health Centre
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 2L8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 College Drive
North Bay Regional Health Centre
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6 Albert Street
West Parry Sound Health Centre
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 2L8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIT ELIZABETH FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIT ELIZABETH FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2023