THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:39:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Prince Philip Dr
St. John's NL A1B 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Prince Philip Dr
St. John's NL A1B 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK CÔTÉ shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CÔTÉ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CÔTÉ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CÔTÉ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CÔTÉ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. CÔTÉ is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. CÔTÉ no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 04 May, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK CÔTÉ shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CÔTÉ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CÔTÉ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CÔTÉ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CÔTÉ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. CÔTÉ is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. CÔTÉ no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 04 May, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Neurology
07 Apr 2025 to 04 May 2025
University of Toronto
EL - Neurology
06 May 2024 to 02 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
EL - Neurology
11 Mar 2024 to 07 Apr 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Neurology
DATE: 07 Apr 2025 to 04 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Neurology
DATE: 06 May 2024 to 02 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Neurology
DATE: 11 Mar 2024 to 07 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2024