THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:33:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
26 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2024 to 25 Mar 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 26 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 25 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024