Medical School:
Instituto Universitario Italiano de Rosario Facultad de Medicina, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery |
02 May 2026 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 01 May 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery |
24 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery |
01 Jan 2024 to 23 Mar 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery
DATE:
02 May 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 01 May 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery
DATE:
24 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jan 2024 to 23 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto