THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: Sharma, Sohil (Used Until: 02 Mar 2024)
Medical School: University of Nottingham School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Sharma, Sohil (Used Until: 02 Mar 2024)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nottingham School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AJAY SHARMA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SHARMA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. SHARMA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHARMA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHARMA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SHARMA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SHARMA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AJAY SHARMA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SHARMA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. SHARMA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHARMA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHARMA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SHARMA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SHARMA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nottingham School of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025