THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:10:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Care Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 3N3
Phone: 519 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Care Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 3N3
Phone: 519 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Feb 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 06 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RACHEL ANNE HART may practise medicine independently in general surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RACHEL ANNE HART may practise medicine independently in general surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Feb 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027