THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:55:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines Manila College of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Philippines Manila College of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL MARK JR MONTES VELASCO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. VELASCO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VELASCO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VELASCO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VELASCO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. VELASCO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. VELASCO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 January, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL MARK JR MONTES VELASCO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. VELASCO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VELASCO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VELASCO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VELASCO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. VELASCO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. VELASCO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 January, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines Manila College of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jan 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
08 Feb 2024 to 30 Apr 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 08 Feb 2024 to 30 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jan 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jan 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024