THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:15:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 212-89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-907-2003
Fax: 416-907-4166

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 08 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 212-89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-907-2003
Fax: 416-907-4166

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 08 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Nov 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 08 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AMANPREET KAUR KALKAT may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and clinical immunology and allergy.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AMANPREET KAUR KALKAT may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and clinical immunology and allergy.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Nov 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2024