THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:52:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
30 Oct 2024 to 28 Nov 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2024 to 29 Oct 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
30 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 30 Oct 2024 to 28 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 29 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 30 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Nov 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2023