THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:49:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad del Rosario Escuela de Medicina y Ciencias de la Salud, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Critical Care
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Critical Care
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad del Rosario Escuela de Medicina y Ciencias de la Salud, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Critical Care
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Critical Care
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA CAMILA BACARO BRAVO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BACARO BRAVO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BACARO BRAVO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BACARO BRAVO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BACARO BRAVO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BACARO BRAVO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BACARO BRAVO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA CAMILA BACARO BRAVO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BACARO BRAVO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BACARO BRAVO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BACARO BRAVO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BACARO BRAVO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BACARO BRAVO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BACARO BRAVO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad del Rosario Escuela de Medicina y Ciencias de la Salud, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jan 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
15 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 14 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
26 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jan 2024 to 25 Mar 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 15 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 14 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 26 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 25 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024