THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:37:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Campinas (UNICAMP) Faculdade de Ciências Médicas, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Heart Institute
Cardiology
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Civic Hospital
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Campinas (UNICAMP) Faculdade de Ciências Médicas, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Heart Institute
Cardiology
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Civic Hospital
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDGAR MATHEUS DA SILVA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DA SILVA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. DA SILVA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DA SILVA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DA SILVA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DA SILVA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DA SILVA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDGAR MATHEUS DA SILVA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DA SILVA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. DA SILVA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DA SILVA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DA SILVA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DA SILVA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DA SILVA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Campinas (UNICAMP) Faculdade de Ciências Médicas, 1997
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
29 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 28 Jul 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 29 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 28 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024