THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:41:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Faculdade de Medicina do ABC (FMABC), Fundação Universitária do ABC, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168131500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Faculdade de Medicina do ABC (FMABC), Fundação Universitária do ABC, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168131500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARX may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MARX is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MARX shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MARX is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MARX shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MARX ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MARX ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 11 February, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARX may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MARX is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MARX shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MARX is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MARX shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MARX ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MARX ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 11 February, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Faculdade de Medicina do ABC (FMABC), Fundação Universitária do ABC, 2002
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2025 to 11 Feb 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
12 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 11 Feb 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
25 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jan 2024 to 24 Mar 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 11 Feb 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 12 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 11 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 25 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 24 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 11 Feb 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 11 Feb 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2024