THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 05:04:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster Children's Hospital - Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster Children's Hospital - Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROZAN ESAM M MURSHID may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MURSHID is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. MURSHID shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MURSHID is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MURSHID shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MURSHID ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MURSHID ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROZAN ESAM M MURSHID may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MURSHID is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. MURSHID shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MURSHID is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MURSHID shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MURSHID ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MURSHID ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
29 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2024 to 28 Jul 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
DATE: 29 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 28 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025