THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:39:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Elizabeth St
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
9/F
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 16 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Elizabeth St
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
9/F
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 16 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Apr 2024
15 Apr 2031
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 16 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Apr 15 2031
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PAK YIN ANTHONY LIU may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Hematology-Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. LIU holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. LIU no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. LIU’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. LIU’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 April, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 15 April, 2031.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PAK YIN ANTHONY LIU may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Hematology-Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. LIU holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. LIU no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. LIU’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. LIU’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 April, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 15 April, 2031.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 15 Apr 2031