THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:50:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bar-Ilan University Faculty of Medicine in the Galilee, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Bar-Ilan University Faculty of Medicine in the Galilee, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bar-Ilan University Faculty of Medicine in the Galilee, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Adult Interventional Cardiology
24 Sep 2024 to 04 Oct 2024
Western University
PEAP - CF - Adult Interventional Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Interventional Cardiology
DATE: 24 Sep 2024 to 04 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Adult Interventional Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Oct 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025