THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:42:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aristotle University of Thessaloniki Medical School, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
UniversityHospital - London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiology/Department of Medicine
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5488889004
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Aristotle University of Thessaloniki Medical School, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
UniversityHospital - London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiology/Department of Medicine
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5488889004
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOTIRIOS DARDAS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DARDAS is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. DARDAS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DARDAS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DARDAS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DARDAS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DARDAS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOTIRIOS DARDAS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DARDAS is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. DARDAS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DARDAS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DARDAS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DARDAS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DARDAS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aristotle University of Thessaloniki Medical School, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Adult Interventional Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Adult Interventional Cardiology
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PEAP - CF - Adult Interventional Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Interventional Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Interventional Cardiology
DATE: 24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Adult Interventional Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024