THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:35:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud bin Abdulaziz University for Health Sciences College of Medicine, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Haroon Rasheed Road
al-Riyad 14326
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud bin Abdulaziz University for Health Sciences College of Medicine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Haroon Rasheed Road
al-Riyad 14326
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUJAIN ABDULAZIZ K ALMAZYAD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALMAZYAD is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALMAZYAD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMAZYAD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALMAZYAD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALMAZYAD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALMAZYAD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUJAIN ABDULAZIZ K ALMAZYAD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALMAZYAD is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALMAZYAD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMAZYAD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALMAZYAD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALMAZYAD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALMAZYAD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud bin Abdulaziz University for Health Sciences College of Medicine, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology
08 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Anesthesiology
DATE: 08 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2024