THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:58:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Ciencias Medicas Andrés Vesalio Guzmán (UCIMED) Escuela de Medicina, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Deparment of Medical Oncology and Hematology
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169464501
Extension: 5429
Fax: 4169466546

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad de Ciencias Medicas Andrés Vesalio Guzmán (UCIMED) Escuela de Medicina, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Deparment of Medical Oncology and Hematology
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169464501
Extension: 5429
Fax: 4169466546

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERICK LAGOS SANCHEZ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERICK LAGOS SANCHEZ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. LAGOS SANCHEZ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Ciencias Medicas Andrés Vesalio Guzmán (UCIMED) Escuela de Medicina, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
25 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
01 Jan 2024 to 24 Mar 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 25 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 24 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Dec 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Dec 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2024