THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:46:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: NUI Galway School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Khalid Bin Abdul Aziz Street
al-Shuhada' 1
Jaber Al Ahmad Hospital
al-Shuhada'
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: NUI Galway School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Khalid Bin Abdul Aziz Street
al-Shuhada' 1
Jaber Al Ahmad Hospital
al-Shuhada'
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BADER M A M A H ALKANDARI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALKANDARI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. ALKANDARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALKANDARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALKANDARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALKANDARI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALKANDARI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BADER M A M A H ALKANDARI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALKANDARI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. ALKANDARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALKANDARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALKANDARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALKANDARI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALKANDARI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: NUI Galway School of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
08 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 08 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2024