Medical School:
Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology |
11 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology |
01 Jul 2025 to 10 Jul 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology |
11 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology |
18 Apr 2024 to 10 Jul 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
DATE:
11 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 10 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
DATE:
11 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology
DATE:
18 Apr 2024 to 10 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa