THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:16:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Christian Medical College, Vellore, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa hospital Cancer Centre
Faculty of Medicine, Department of Radiology, Radiation Oncology & medical Physics
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Christian Medical College, Vellore, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa hospital Cancer Centre
Faculty of Medicine, Department of Radiology, Radiation Oncology & medical Physics
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANINDITA DAS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DAS is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. DAS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DAS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DAS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DAS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DAS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANINDITA DAS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DAS is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. DAS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DAS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DAS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DAS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DAS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Christian Medical College, Vellore, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024