THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:52:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jordan University of Science and Technology Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jordan University of Science and Technology Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOLTAN KHALAILA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KHALAILA is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. KHALAILA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHALAILA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KHALAILA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KHALAILA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KHALAILA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOLTAN KHALAILA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KHALAILA is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. KHALAILA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHALAILA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KHALAILA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KHALAILA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KHALAILA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jordan University of Science and Technology Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
28 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
01 Apr 2024 to 27 May 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 28 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Apr 2024 to 27 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2024