THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:32:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bashar Bin Burd Street
al-'Aqrabiyyah
al-Khabar 34445
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 013 895 7999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bashar Bin Burd Street
al-'Aqrabiyyah
al-Khabar 34445
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 013 895 7999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMEERA AHMAD A NEMER may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. NEMER is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. NEMER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NEMER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NEMER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. NEMER ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. NEMER ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 29 August, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMEERA AHMAD A NEMER may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. NEMER is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. NEMER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NEMER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NEMER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. NEMER ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. NEMER ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 29 August, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
23 Sep 2024 to 29 Aug 2025
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
01 Jul 2024 to 28 Aug 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 29 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 28 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 29 Aug 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 29 Aug 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024