THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:32:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade de São Paulo Faculdade de Medicina São Paulo (FMSP-USP), 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Avenida Albert Einstein 627
Morumbi
Emergency Room
São Paulo SP 05652000
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidade de São Paulo Faculdade de Medicina São Paulo (FMSP-USP), 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Avenida Albert Einstein 627
Morumbi
Emergency Room
São Paulo SP 05652000
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAIS COSTA MARQUES may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. COSTA MARQUES is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. COSTA MARQUES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. COSTA MARQUES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. COSTA MARQUES shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. COSTA MARQUES ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. COSTA MARQUES ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 April, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAIS COSTA MARQUES may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. COSTA MARQUES is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. COSTA MARQUES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. COSTA MARQUES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. COSTA MARQUES shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. COSTA MARQUES ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. COSTA MARQUES ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 April, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade de São Paulo Faculdade de Medicina São Paulo (FMSP-USP), 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Apr 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
24 Jul 2024 to 30 Apr 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 24 Jul 2024 to 30 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 23 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Apr 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Apr 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2024