THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:51:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond St
Postgraduate Medical Education Office
Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry
Western University
London ON N6A 5C1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond St
Postgraduate Medical Education Office
Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry
Western University
London ON N6A 5C1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFAISAL HASHIM A NEYAZI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. NEYAZI is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. NEYAZI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NEYAZI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NEYAZI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. NEYAZI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. NEYAZI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFAISAL HASHIM A NEYAZI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. NEYAZI is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. NEYAZI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NEYAZI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NEYAZI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. NEYAZI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. NEYAZI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025