THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:53:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Complutense de Madrid Facultad de Medicina, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Complutense de Madrid Facultad de Medicina, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Complutense de Madrid Facultad de Medicina, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
24 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
01 Apr 2024 to 23 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 24 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Apr 2024 to 23 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2024