THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:49:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Guadalajara Centro Universitario de Ciencias de la Salud, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad de Guadalajara Centro Universitario de Ciencias de la Salud, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA NAYELI VENEGAS GODÍNEZ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 April, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA NAYELI VENEGAS GODÍNEZ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. VENEGAS GODÍNEZ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 April, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Guadalajara Centro Universitario de Ciencias de la Salud, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Apr 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
24 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
01 May 2024 to 23 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 24 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 May 2024 to 23 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Apr 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Apr 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2024