THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:02:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Prince Alfred Hospital
12 Missenden Rd
Camperdown NSW 2050
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Prince Alfred Hospital
12 Missenden Rd
Camperdown NSW 2050
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIN-SOO PARK may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PARK is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PARK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PARK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PARK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. PARK ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. PARK ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 October, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIN-SOO PARK may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PARK is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PARK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PARK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PARK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. PARK ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. PARK ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 October, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Oct 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery
09 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 08 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery
17 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 09 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 08 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 17 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Oct 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Oct 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2024