THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:32:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
EL - Respirology
03 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
EL - Respirology
08 Apr 2024 to 05 May 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Respirology
DATE: 03 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Respirology
DATE: 08 Apr 2024 to 05 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2024