THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:30:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602 - 500 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602 - 500 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT HENRY BOURKE may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BOURKE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BOURKE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOURKE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BOURKE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BOURKE ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BOURKE ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT HENRY BOURKE may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BOURKE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BOURKE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOURKE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BOURKE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BOURKE ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BOURKE ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
09 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Geriatric Medicine
16 Sep 2024 to 08 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 09 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 16 Sep 2024 to 08 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025