THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:50:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAAR AHARONI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AHARONI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. AHARONI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AHARONI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AHARONI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AHARONI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AHARONI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAAR AHARONI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AHARONI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. AHARONI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AHARONI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AHARONI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AHARONI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AHARONI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
06 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2024 to 05 Aug 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 06 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 05 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024