THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:54:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kentucky College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eastern Ave
71 - Cayman Medical
KY1-1209
PO BOX 32322
Grand Cayman
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-345-623-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Kentucky College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eastern Ave
71 - Cayman Medical
KY1-1209
PO BOX 32322
Grand Cayman
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-345-623-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MAURICE KWINTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWINTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MAURICE KWINTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWINTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kentucky College of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2024